Accounts and annual returns THE DIANA BRIMBLECOMBE ANIMAL RESCUE CENTRE

Charity Number: 288473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 03 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 November 2023 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 05 November 2023 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 November 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 02 November 2022 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window