THE DIANA BRIMBLECOMBE ANIMAL RESCUE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to provide care and shelter for animals that are stray, neglected or are otherwise in need of assistance and to protect animals from ill-usage, cruelty and suffering and to advance the education of the public in the needs and proper care of animals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 09 January 1984: Standard registration
- ANIMAL RESCUE GROUP WOKINGHAM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DONNA PENFOLD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Tara Louise Mills | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
TOM WHITE | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANET HOUSELANDER-YOUNG | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Runnacles | Trustee | 25 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Heather Quillish | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Carol Sykes | Trustee | 27 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA JUNE SPARSHOTT | Trustee | 18 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £358.36k | £298.25k | £273.06k | £242.18k | £294.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £393.14k | £319.69k | £332.79k | £387.16k | £354.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.48k | £1.62k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 November 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 November 2023 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 APRIL 1997 AS AMENDED 26 APRIL 2002, 10 MAY 2006 AND 13 MAY 2008.
Charitable objects
1. THE PROVISION OF CARE AND SHELTER FOR ANIMALS THAT ARE STRAY, NEGLECTED OR ARE OTHERWISE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE AND THE PROTECTION OF ANIMALS FROM ILL-USAGE, CRUELTY AND SUFFERING. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE NEEDS AND PROPER CARE OF ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
WOKINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE DIANA BRIMBLECOMBE
ANIMAL RESCUE CENTRE
NELSONS LANE
HURST
READING
RG10 0RR
- Phone:
- 01189341122
- Email:
- dbarc2020@yahoo.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window