SOMERSET COUNTY ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity exists to provide live orchestral music to the community. We hold 3 or 4 symphony concerts each year. Soloists are often young people who live, or used to go to school, in our area. Adults & students play in the orchestra.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
46 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
- Somerset
Governance
- 13 January 1984: Standard registration
- SOMERSET ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Macadam | Chair | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frances Burns | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Coglan | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.76k | £1.65k | £12.84k | £11.59k | £16.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.51k | £2.03k | £13.67k | £14.00k | £10.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20TH SEPTEMBER 1983 AND AMENDED 6TH OCTOBER 1989
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE IMPROVE DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Owl Barn
Trickey Warren Farm
Culmhead
TAUNTON
TA3 7DY
- Phone:
- 07498 045406
- Email:
- burnswindrush@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
somersetcountyorchestra.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window