Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF HAYLANDS FARM

Charity Number: 288495
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 October 2024 04 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2023 16 August 2024 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2022 08 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2021 31 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2020 31 March 2022 242 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2020 Not Required