Financial history THE FRIENDS OF HAYLANDS FARM

Charity number: 288495
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/10/2020 01/10/2021 01/10/2022 01/10/2023 01/10/2024
Total gross income £5.31k £0 £2.92k £38 £298
Total expenditure £1.37k £264 £0 £1.19k £846
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A