THE FRIENDS OF HAYLANDS FARM

Charity Number: 288495
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote the relief of learning difficulties attending Haylands Farm, Ryde by supporting the work of the Farm and supplementing the services provided

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 October 2024

Total income: £298
Total expenditure: £846

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Isle Of Wight

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 February 1984: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Samuel Jefferies Trustee 01 December 2022
ISLE OF WIGHT MENCAP
Received: On time
Christopher Ford Trustee 01 December 2022
ISLE OF WIGHT MENCAP
Received: On time
Jodie Warrington Trustee 13 January 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/10/2020 01/10/2021 01/10/2022 01/10/2023 01/10/2024
Total gross income £5.31k £0 £2.92k £38 £298
Total expenditure £1.37k £264 £0 £1.19k £846
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 October 2024 04 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2023 16 August 2024 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2022 08 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2021 31 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2020 31 March 2022 242 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
34 Salters Road
RYDE
PO33 3HU
Phone:
01983566038
Website:

No information available