FEN DITTON RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Parish Council owns the Recreation Ground which is held in charity & provides Recreation Facilities for the village. All councillors are Trustees & maintain & administer the Facilities including football & cricket pitches, basketball court, children's playground & a wildlife area. Sponsored walks & running clubs use the grounds.The Pavilion is used as a meeting place for community events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 23 January 1984: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fen Ditton Parish Council | Trustee | 22 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.38k | £11.89k | £4.99k | £2.31k | £5.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £841 | £1.20k | £4.77k | £2.95k | £1.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19TH DECEMBER 1983 DECLARATION OF TRUST AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 17/03/2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF FEN DITTON FOR USE AS A PUBLIC RECREATION GROUND.
Area of benefit
FEN DITTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
FEN DITTON PARISH COUNCIL
OFFICE 1
2 JUBILEE SQUARE
CAMBRIDGE
CB5 8UW
- Phone:
- 01223862687
- Email:
- CLERK@FENDITTON-PC.GOV.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window