JAMES MYATT TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The James Myatt Memorial Fund is a charitable settlement. Its aim is to promote a sense of responsibility and self reliance in disadvantaged young people by giving them experience of and training in seamanship, navigation and boat handling and being a member of a ships company.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 January 1984: Standard registration
- 18 March 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 18 March 2024: Funds transferred to 1073048 THE RONA TRUST
- JAMES MYATT MEMORIAL FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2018 | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.71k | £11.92k | £6.42k | £7.57k | £2.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.04k | £12.98k | £11.87k | £486 | £2.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 09 March 2022 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 14TH NOVEMBER 1983 AND MINUTES OF MEETING AS AMENDED ON 24/10/2009
Charitable objects
SUCH EDUCATIONAL OBJECTS OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING PROVISIONS) FOR ANY EDUCATIONAL OBJECTS OR PURPOSES TENDING TO PROMOTE A SENSE OF RESPONSIBILITY AND SELF-RELIANCE IN DISADVANTED YOUNG PEOPLE BY GIVING THEM EXPERIENCE OF AND TRAINING IN SEAMANSHIP NAVIGATION AND BOAT-HANDLING AND BEING A MEMBER OF A SHIP'S COMPANY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window