EAST KENT ITEC LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the vocational preparation, training and retraining of people, mainly but not exclusively those resident and/or being employed or trained by organisations based in the County of Kent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 01 February 1984: Standard registration
- EAST KENT TRAINING ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- THANET YOUTH TRAINING ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- THE EKTA ORGANISATION LTD (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANETTE ANN PATRICK | Trustee | 12 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL RIDER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICHOLAS DYNES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.54k | £255.49k | £493.99k | £165.40k | £244.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £238.68k | £359.91k | £434.22k | £351.33k | £283.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £87.25k | £118.18k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEM AND ARTS OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 OCTOBER 1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 13 MARCH 1986, 28 MAY 1987, 13 OCTOBER 1988, 16 OCTOBER 1991, 14 MAY 1993, 29TH AUGUST 1997 AND 16 MARCH 2001.
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE VOCATIONAL PREPARATION, TRAINING AND RETRAINING PEOPLE, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE RESIDENT AND/OR BEING EMPLOYED OR TRAINED BY ORGANISATIONS BASED IN THE COUNTY OF KENT. (B) TO RELIEVE NEED AMONG UNEMPLOYED PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE COUNTY OF KENT THROUGH THE CREATION OF NEW JOBS AND TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES AND PROGRAMMES.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kent Innovation Centre
Millennium Way
Thanet Reach Business Park
BROADSTAIRS
Kent
CT10 2QQ
- Phone:
- 01843233433
- Email:
- itec@ekitec.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window