THE BRITISH STEEL PLC CORBY EMPLOYEES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 288566
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

DONATIONS TO ORGANISATIONS IN THE LOCAL AREA

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012

Total income: £7
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 January 1984: Standard registration
  • 09 June 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE BRITISH STEEL CORPORATION CORBY CHARITABLE AID FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012
Total gross income £5.44k £5.01k £7 £7 £7
Total expenditure £5.20k £4.95k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2012 12 November 2013 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 26 November 2012 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required