SOUTH CROYDON CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Centre is to provide facilities in the interest of social welfare for recreation and leisure-time occupation so as to improve the conditions of life for the elderly in South Croydon. It is open Monday and Thursday of each week and provides a range of social and stimulating activities and occasional outings, and offers a hot meal each day. Transport is arranged for the less able.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Croydon
Governance
- 27 February 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Geoffrey James William Dumbreck | Trustee | 22 July 2019 |
|
|||||||
VALERIE BAILEY WILLIAMS | Trustee | 19 July 2005 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN CHARLES MILL | Trustee | 16 January 1984 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.43k | £17.53k | £12.08k | £29.65k | £16.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.69k | £12.50k | £17.39k | £18.21k | £30.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.00k | £2.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16TH JANUARY 1984
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN THE MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE BY ASSOCIATING WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ELDERLY. THE "AREA OF BENEFIT" SHALL BE THE AREA FALLING WITHIN A RADIUS OF 1 1/2 MILES OF ST. PETERS CHURCH HALL, LEDBURY ROAD, SOUTH CROYDON IN GREATER LONDON.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOUTH CROYDON CENTRE
REAR OF ST PETER'S HALL
LEDBURY ROAD
CROYDON
CR0 1EP
- Phone:
- 02086817948
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window