THE WOOLLEY FIRS CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the conservation, creation, maintenance, and study for the benefit of the public of places and objects of ornithological, arboricultural, entomological, botanical, zoological, or scientific interest or of natural beauty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 01 February 1984: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alex Hirtzel | Chair |
|
|
|||||
William Assheton | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lucy E Baier | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.09k | £14.99k | £17.95k | £18.80k | £21.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.29k | £7.16k | £3.58k | £19.35k | £14.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 3RD JANUARY 1984
Charitable objects
1. PROMOTING THE CONSERVATION CREATION MAINTENANCE AND STUDY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF PLACES AND OBJECTS OF ORNITHOLIOGICAL ABRORICULTURAL ENTOMOLOGICAL BOTANICAL ZOOLOGICAL OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST OR OF NATURAL BEAUTY IN BERKSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE. 2. PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF FARMING COMPATIBLE WITH THE CONSERVATION OF FLORA AND FAUNA AND THE APPRECIATION OF NATURAL BEAUTY. 3. PROMOTING ORGANISING AND CARRYING ON STUDY AND RESEARCH IN THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTCE OF THE CONSERVATION OF NATURE AND THE USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY AND RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 NORTH END
BASSINGBOURN
ROYSTON
SG8 5NX
- Phone:
- 01763241168
- Email:
- alexhirtzel@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window