THE BRITISH BOY SCOUTS AND GIRL SCOUTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Training young people in self reliance, outdoor pursuits and public service
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 March 1984: Standard registration
- 02 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 14 October 2009: Standard registration
- BRITISH BOY SCOUTS (Working name)
- BROTHERHOOD OF BRITISH SCOUTS (Working name)
- NATIONAL PEACE SCOUTS (Working name)
- THE BROTHERHOOD OF BRITISH SCOUTS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID COOKSLEY RIBA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JOSEPH LLOYD BOSENCE | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MICHAEL STEVENS | Trustee | 28 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.40k | £18.11k | £12.07k | £8.81k | £12.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.05k | £8.72k | £12.38k | £11.06k | £14.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 February 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JUNE 1984 AS AMENDED 17 FEBRUARY 1985, 5 OCTOBER 1986 AND 30 NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND TO DEVELOP GOOD CITIZENSHIP, ASSISTING THEM TO SERVE OTHER PEOPLE AND TO BECOME SELF RELIANT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 06 March 1984 : Standard registration
- 02 September 2009 : Removed
- 14 October 2009 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Gatcombe Close
Calcot
READING
Berkshire
RG31 4XQ
- Phone:
- 01189432937
- Email:
- grandscout@bbsandbgs.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window