THE CANON COLLINS EDUCATIONAL TRUST FOR SOUTHERN AFRICA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Governance
- 16 February 1984: Standard registration
- 06 April 2005: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 06 April 2005: Funds transferred to 1102028 CANON COLLINS TRUST
- CANON COLLINS EDUCATIONAL TRUST FOR SOUTHERN AFRICA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.84m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.65m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 29/02/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | |
|
Other assets | N/A | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2004 | 19 January 2005 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2004 | 15 September 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6TH JANUARY 1984 AS AMENDED BY A DECLARATION OF RECONSTITUTED TRUST DATED 28TH MAY 1999
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PEOPLE OF SOUTHERN AFRICA (WHICH IS DEFINED AS SOUTH AFRICA, NAMIBIA, ANGOLA, MALAWI, ZIMBABWE, LESOTHO, BOTSWANA, SWAZILAND, MOZAMBIQUE, ZAMBIA, TANZANIA) TO ASSIST WITH EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT, EMBRACING BOTH FORMAL AND NON-FORMAL EDUCATION, THE DEVELOPMENT OF COUNTRIES IN SOUTHERN AFRICA ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON SOUTH AFRICA IN ITS PERIOD OF TRANSITION FROM EXCLUSION, DEPRIVATION AND REPRESSION UNDER APARTHEID TO PARTICIPATION, OPPORTUNITY AND RESPONSIBILITY, FOCUSING ON THE SKILLS AND EDUCATION MOST NEEDED FOR DEVELOPMENT IN SOUTHERN AFRICA.
Area of benefit
SOUTHERN AFRICA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window