Financial history NORTH EAST MITCHAM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 288659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £126.99k £129.68k £106.11k £106.11k £89.69k
Total expenditure £115.23k £106.52k £104.65k £104.65k £68.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £38.60k £39.60k £4.04k £48.61k £55.10k