Governing document THE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY
Charity number: 288668

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST JULY 1980 AS AMENDED 18TH JULY 1983, 15 SEPTEMBER 2003 AND 12 SEPTEMBER 2004. AS AMENDED ON 18 SEP 2017 as amended on 17 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDY OF GENEALOGY AND FAMILY HISTORY IN GENERAL, BUT WITH PARTICULAR INTEREST IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
COUNTY OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.