MABE COMMUNITY HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a community hall, children's playground, wheelsports park and football field to the village of Mabe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £800 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 08 February 1984: Standard registration
- MYCP (Working name)
- MABE SHINDIG (Previous name)
- MABE YOUTH AND COMMUNITY PROJECT (Previous name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jackie Frost | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Newton | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Bernard Brian Lawrence | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.32k | £23.62k | £14.90k | £16.77k | £19.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.94k | £11.15k | £8.30k | £18.82k | £21.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.43k | £4.50k | £550 | £800 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 March 2024 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 MAY 1973 AS AMENDED ON 05 JAN 1984 AS AMENDED ON 15 NOV 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF MABE IN THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF MABE IN THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
MABE COMMUNITY HUB
Primelin Place
Cunningham Park
Mabe Burnthouse
PENRYN
TR10 9HB
- Phone:
- 01326375938
- Email:
- mabeycp@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window