Financial history PARKSIDE HOSPITAL RADIO

Charity Number: 288683
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £13 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £50 £0 £0 £0 £1.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A