THE ADLER TRUST

Charity number: 288685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To support the activities as directed by the Trustees

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 April 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE RT HON SIR BERNARD RIX Trustee 01 September 1991
COEXIST HOUSE
Received: On time
HEART CELLS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Martin Paisner CBE MA LLM Trustee
SHAARE ZEDEK UK
Received: On time
WORCESTER COLLEGE OXFORD ENDOWMENT TRUST
Received: On time
THE MARCUS MARGULIES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE STUART YOUNG FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MORRIS LEIGH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
TRUSTEES OF THE LONDON CLINIC LIMITED
Received: On time
THE TRUST FOR THE STUDY OF SOCIAL TRAUMA AND THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF SURVIVORS
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF THE ISRAEL CANCER ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE MAURICE AND VIVIENNE WOHL PHILANTHROPIC FOUNDATION
Received: On time
NEW ISRAEL FUND
Received: On time
OHEL SARAH UK
Received: On time
THE LILY AND MARCUS SIEFF CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
TEALE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE WEIZMANN INSTITUTE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DEVONSHIRE STREET CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE PETER CRUDDAS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE DENISE COHEN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SIR SIGMUND STERNBERG CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE SHIRLEY YOUNG CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SCHMIDT-BODNER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
HADASSAH MEDICAL RELIEF ASSOCIATION U.K.
Received: On time
THE RUTH AND JACK LUNZER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE STELLA AND ALEXANDER MARGULIES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SYBIL SHINE MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
YONI JESNER FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE ROSENBLATT FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE AMERICAN JEWISH JOINT DISTRIBUTION COMMITTEE (UK ) TRUST
Received: On time
JANET WOLFSON DE BOTTON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE CISSIE ROSEFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE BLUSTON CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
THE POTEL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE BARNETT AND SYLVIA SHINE NO 2 CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE LATCHMAN FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE WOLFSON FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 18 March 2025 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 18 March 2025 407 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 10 May 2023 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 29 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 22 March 2021 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13 DECEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE EQUIP STAFF MAINTAIN AND INSURE OFFICES FOR THE USE OF ANY PERSON WHO HAS RETIRED FROM THE POST OF CHEIF RABBI OF THE UNITED SYNAGOGUE OF THE HEBREW CONGREGATIONS OF THE BRITISH COMMONWEALTH FOR ANY CHARITABLE WORK FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES OF ORTHODOX JUDASISM (AND OTHERWISE AS SET OUT IN THE DEED)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 14 April 1994 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Adler Trust
PO Box 72007
LONDON
NW6 6RW
Phone:
02072866391
Website:

No information available