Financial history THE ARTS SOCIETY NORTH DEVON

Charity number: 288694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £5.05k £4.19k £4.21k £10.00k £11.29k
Total expenditure £7.76k £5.40k £10.24k £12.36k £11.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A