Financial history NETLEY MARSH STEAM ENGINE RALLY CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 288725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £37.99k £1.01k £15 £75.11k £42.26k
Total expenditure £17.87k £76 £0 £32.55k £38.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A