CHURCH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant making Trust
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 20 February 1984: Standard registration
- ST LEONARDS CHURCH TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert John Charles Donnell | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Giles Pemberton | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Gunnar Maintzer | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
KATHARINE DALLAS | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS BUTTERWORTH | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN BADDON | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER SIDNEY MATTHEWS | Trustee | 24 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN BRIGHT | Trustee | 04 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAULA JOY ANGELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.15k | £5.21k | £5.29k | £106.47k | £9.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.35k | £10.15k | £6.45k | £3.77k | £5.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF THE COMMISSIONERS OF 15TH DECEMBER 1896 AND 27TH JUNE 1911 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20TH SEPTEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
(1) AS TO ONE-SIXTEENTH THEREOF FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (2) AS TO A FURTHER SEVEN-SIXTEENTHS THEREOF IN OR TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LEONARD, ST. LEONARDS AND THE CHURCHYARD AND OTHER PROPERTY THEREOF AND IN ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING AN EXTRAORDINARY REPAIR FUND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS HEREINAFTER CONTAINED. (3) AS TO THE REMAINING EIGHT-SIXTEENTHS THEREOF THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY SUCH PART AS THEY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT IN OR TOWARDS THE PAYMENT OF EXPENSES INCURRED BY THE INCUMBENT OF THE BENEFICE OF HAWRIDGE WITH CHOLESBURY AND ST. LEONARDS IN CARRYING OUT HIS DUTIES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND SUBJECT THERETO IN DEFRAYING THE EXPENSES OF MAINTAINING SERVICES AT THE SAID CHURCH. (4) ANY REMAINING PART OF THE SAID INCOME NOT REQUIRED FOR APPLICATION IN MANNER AFORESAID SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE TRUSTEES IN FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LEONARD, ST. LEONARDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Home Meadow House
St. Leonards
TRING
Hertfordshire
HP23 6NP
- Phone:
- 01494758549
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window