THE LISTER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
It is the objective of the trustees to restrict the number of different charities helped through donations in order to achieve focus, optimum effect and the close personal interest and involvement of the trustees in the areas selected.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Morocco
- Romania
- United States
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 28 February 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOE HARVEY HORNE | Trustee | 17 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
TOMAS ROBERT HORNE | Trustee | 16 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Barclay Horne | Trustee | 20 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
SAMUEL CHARLES HORNE | Trustee | 15 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
PENNY HORNE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.30k | £121.17k | £128.77k | £156.78k | £147.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.66k | £182.16k | £298.23k | £191.31k | £244.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 25 March 2024 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 25 March 2024 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 20TH OCTOBER 1981
Charitable objects
TO PAY OF APPLY THE SAID INCOME AND (IF AND SO OFTEN AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT) THE WHOLE OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND AS THEY SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES (WHICH WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TERMS SHALL INCLUDE ANY CHARITABLE TRUSTS INSTITUTIONS FOUNDATIONS OR OTHER ORGANISATION) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OR IN ANY OTHER PART OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Apperley Ltd
45 Welbeck Street
LONDON
W1G 8DZ
- Phone:
- 02074860800
- Email:
- info@apperleylimited.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window