THE FRIENDS OF COURTLANDS SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 288745
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 05 April 1984: Standard registration
- 22 April 1996: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- THE FRIENDS OF SOUTH BRISTOL SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 15TH NOVEMBER 1983 AS AMENDED 14TH MARCH 1984 AND 11TH JANUARY 1989
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE WELFARE OF ALL PUPILS OF THE COURTLANDS SCHOOL (FOR PHYSICALLY AND VISUALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN). (B) TO PROVIDE, OR ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE TREATMENT, EDUCATION, TRAINING, REHABILITATION AND WELFARE EX PUPILS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.