ADLERIAN SOCIETY (OF THE UNITED KINGDOM) AND INSTITUTE FOR INDIVIDUAL PSYCHOLOGY (A.S.I.I.P)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We promote the understanding, application and development of Individual Psychology and Adlerian Counselling in the UK through public lectures, workshops, conferences and professional training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 February 1982: Standard registration
- ASIIP (Working name)
- ADLERIAN SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANINA BELL | Chair | 25 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Allsop | Trustee | 26 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jill Reynolds | Trustee | 06 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Novak | Trustee | 25 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire DeShon | Trustee | 22 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alex Marsden | Trustee | 25 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MAGNUS IRVINE | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.70k | £22.26k | £10.24k | £15.85k | £17.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.48k | £20.08k | £9.80k | £10.49k | £18.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 February 2025 | 239 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 March 2022 | 252 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 01 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 10TH JANUARY 1984 AS AMENDED 9TH JUNE 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE WORK OF ALFRED ADLER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Cheese Dairy
Login
Whitland
Carmarthenshire
Carmarthenshire
SA34 0TJ
- Phone:
- 07857146902
- Email:
- admin@asiip.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window