THE GREAT ORMOND STREET TRUST FOR THE HOSPITALS FOR SICK CHILDREN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout London
Governance
- 15 March 1984: Standard registration
- 10 February 2005: Removed
- 10 February 2005: Funds transferred to 1160024-115 GREAT ORMOND STREET HOSPITAL CHILDREN'S CHARITY (1...
- GREAT ORMOND STREET HOSPITAL DEVELOPMENT TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 17 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 17 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6TH FEBRUARY 1984
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AMONGST CHILDREN; AND (B) IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING:- (I) TO ASSIST FURTHER PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES CARRIED ON AT THE HOSPITAL; AND (II) TO RAISE AND APPLY MONEY FOR AND TO ENTER INTO BUILDING AND OTHER CONTRACTS FOR THE REBUILDING OF THE 19TH CENTURY SECTION OF THE HOSPITAL AT GREAT ORMOND STREET AND THE CONSTRUCTION OF NEW HOSPITAL BUILDINGS THERE TOGETHER WITH THE FURNISHINGS AND PROVISION THEREOF WITH APPROPRIATE PLANT MACHINERY AND EQUIPMENT AND ALL WORKS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window