Governing document INSTANT MUSCLE LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7TH FEBRUARY 1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 11/12/1985, 5/5/1989, 20/2/1991, 20/5/1992, 3/3/1993 AND 19TH AUGUST 2003
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST PERSONS WHO THROUGH THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES ARE IN NEED AND SUBJECT THERETO OTHERS WHO WISH TO FURTHER THEIR EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING TO ENABLE THEM TO ACQUIRE PROFESSIONAL VOCATIONAL CRAFT TRADE, INDUSTRIAL, COMMERCIAL OR OTHER SKILLS AND TO WORK EXPERIENCE WITH A VIEW TO ESTABLISHING THEM IN EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.