THE ORAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run training programmes in oral history techniques, run a website, publish a journal, run a regional network, offer advice, run an annual conference, act as a focal point for oral history and deal with ethical issues, archiving and technical developments for dissemination.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

21 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 March 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor John Gabriel BA PhD | Chair | 15 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Mary Wood | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Neville | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Juanita Anne Cox | Trustee | 09 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Mohammed Ijaz Ul-haq Faheem Chishti | Trustee | 09 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mx Erum Nazeer Dahar | Trustee | 09 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alan John Butler | Trustee | 10 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Bethan Vickers | Trustee | 10 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Cai Morgan Parry Jones | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amy Tooth Murphy | Trustee | 15 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Juliana Dempsey | Trustee | 02 July 2010 |
|
|
||||
Padmini Broomfield | Trustee | 04 July 2008 |
|
|
||||
Dr ROBERT B PERKS MBE DLitt | Trustee | 03 May 1986 |
|
|
||||
DR ROB PERKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR JOANNA BORNAT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BETH THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VERUSCA CALABRIA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Mary Stewart | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr CRAIG TRUMAN FEES | Trustee |
|
||||||
CYNTHIA BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNY HARDING PHD MSC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.80k | £41.32k | £49.25k | £72.52k | £77.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.89k | £36.37k | £48.92k | £64.55k | £77.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/10/1983 AS AMENDED ON 06/07/2007 AS AMENDED ON 19/07/2014 AS AMENDED ON 15 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE METHODS AND PRACTICE OF ORAL HISTORY IN ALL APPROPRIATE FIELDS AND TO ENCOURAGE THE DUSCUSSION OF METHODOLOGY, TECHNICAL PROBLEMS AND ALL REVEVANT MATTERS BY THE PUBLICATION OF A JOURNAL AND BY THE ORGANISATION OF CONFERENCES AND MEETINGS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Quarry House
Upper Aston
Montgomery
Powys
SY15 6TA
- Phone:
- 01732 824085
- Email:
- ohs@ohs.org.uk
- Website:
-
ohs.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window