SHIPTON BELLINGER VILLAGE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a village community hall for lease by local organisations and private functions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 13 March 1984: Standard registration
- SHIPTON BELLINGER VILLAGE COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM CHARNLEY | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Jean Sperry | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Miller | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Heaton | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
LUCY FINN | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
NATASHA HANDOLL | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MARSH | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN LUXTON | Trustee | 11 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW SULLIVAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR MIKE ENGLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.00k | £22.70k | £20.73k | £17.86k | £19.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.97k | £20.68k | £33.33k | £19.97k | £21.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £19.91k | £8.00k | N/A | £2.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14TH FEBRUARY 1984
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF A VILLAGE HALL AND CENTRE FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SHIPTON BELLINGER WITHOUT DISTINCITON OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARIS OF SHIPTON BELLINGER
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 WILTON TERRACE
SHIPTON BELLINGER
TIDWORTH
SP9 7UJ
- Phone:
- 01980842067
- Email:
- mike_55@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window