THE MARCUS GARVEY FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provide help and assistance to the community as well as running a Saturday school. provide assistance with building a school in the Gambia. Provide assistance to sibling group to attend school in Ghana.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
- Ghana
- The Gambia
Governance
- 29 February 1984: Standard registration
- 09 July 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- AL-AHYAA FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2004 | 31/01/2007 | 31/01/2008 | 31/01/2009 | 31/01/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £785 | £1.82k | £1.61k | £1.51k | £2.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £999 | £1.77k | £900 | £962 | £1.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2010 | 16 January 2011 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2009 | 29 December 2010 | 394 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 FEBRUARY 1984
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERATIONS OF AFRO-CARIBBEAN PEOPLE WHO HAVE SETTLED IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THROUGH THEM PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PEOPLES OF AFRICA AND THE CARIBBEAN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window