CHARITY OF THOMAS BLAMEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We were set up for the people who live in and around the parish of Veryan on the Roseland Peninsula in Cornwall, so they could access sport. We are the home of Veryan Indoor Bowls, Veryan & District Outdoor Bowls, Veryan Cricket Club, Veryan and District Tennis Club and Veryan Football Club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 07 March 1984: Standard registration
- VERYAN PLAYING FIELD MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
- VERYAN SPORTS AND SOCIAL CLUB (Working name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Couch | Chair | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Hopper | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Dixon | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michaela Jean Darby | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Damian Couch | Trustee | 05 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.62k | £72.89k | £76.28k | £64.14k | £66.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.93k | £50.92k | £60.96k | £72.13k | £57.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 January 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 January 2024 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 December 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 December 2022 | 38 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 December 2021 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 December 2021 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9TH DECEMBER 1983
Charitable objects
A RECREATION GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF VERYAN IN THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL IN SUCH MANNER AS THE COMMITTEE OF MANAGEMENT FROM TIME TO TIME SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF VERYAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Veryan Sports & Social Club
Elerkey Lane
Veryan
Truro
Cornwall
TR2 5UW
- Phone:
- 01872501685
- Email:
- treasurer.vsasc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window