Trustees GHAUSIA COMMITTEE AYLESBURY (AYLESBURY MOSQUE)
Charity number: 288864

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
32 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Masud Khan | Chair | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mukhtar Hussain | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zeeshan Anwar | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sanober Khan | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mohsan Zeb | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Novid Shaid | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Waheed Raja | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Saeed Ahmed | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Qayum Gul | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shoaib Ahmed | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Itimad Hussain Raja | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sajid Rehman | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Talin Hussain | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Muhammed Jamil | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Naveed Khan | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Khyber Khan | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Nazakat | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zahid Shah | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Altaf | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Munir Hussain | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Muneeb Khan | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Irshad Ahmed | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Junaid | Trustee | 06 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Said Wazir Khan | Trustee | 26 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ajaz Arif | Trustee | 09 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Zaheer | Trustee | 09 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Waseem Khan | Trustee | 09 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMED YOUSAF KHAN | Trustee | 09 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
TALIB HUSSAIN | Trustee | 08 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
TUFFAIL HUSSAIN | Trustee | 08 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
KARAM HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MUKHTAR UL HAQ | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.