FRIENDS OF BOLIVIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Bolivia charity founded to relieve poverty, advance education and promote health in Bolivia, South America. Our mission is to help to improve the living conditions of Bolivia's poorest and neediest, particularly women, children and elderly people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bolivia
Governance
- 07 March 1984: Standard registration
- 23 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 20 October 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Juan Carlos Lozada | Chair | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Suarez Mash | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Isabel Terrazas | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julio Salas | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Juan Enrique Montes | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Waldo Alberto Terrazas | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nancy Alarcon | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marcela Montes | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.33k | £12.88k | £21.50k | £12.38k | £13.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.06k | £13.72k | £9.88k | £13.92k | £10.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH JANUARY 1984 AS AMENDED 29 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE POVERTY, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROMOTE HEALTH IN BOLIVIA, AND 2. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND CULTURE OF BOLIVIA.
Area of benefit
BOLIVIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 CALDBECK AVENUE
WORCESTER PARK
KT4 8BQ
- Phone:
- 02084043122
- Email:
- info@friendsofbolivia.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window