CHARWELTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 288904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To Provide a Venue where the local community can come together and experience Touring Arts Productions, Keep Fit, Pancake Races, Quiz Nights, Suppers and many other enjoyable events. Charwelton Village Hall has a Calendar of Events which are diverse and entertaining.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 03 October 2024

Total income: £4,572
Total expenditure: £4,759

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 March 1984: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dawn Aries Trustee 01 December 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 03/10/2020 03/10/2021 03/10/2022 03/10/2023 03/10/2024
Total gross income £12.09k £2.90k £2.64k £2.84k £4.57k
Total expenditure £1.85k £13.60k £4.04k £1.89k £4.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 October 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2024 Not Required
Annual return 03 October 2023 15 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 03 October 2022 31 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 03 October 2021 22 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 03 October 2020 08 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Foxhall Farmhouse
Banbury Road
Charwelton
Daventry
NN11 3YY
Phone:
01327261817