Financial history REDESDALE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 288918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £30.09k £28.51k £28.33k £23.29k £31.78k
Total expenditure £19.03k £11.69k £37.68k £26.48k £14.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.99k N/A £7.20k £27.00k