Trustees Ovalhouse Theatre Limited
Charity number: 288931

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Valentine Graham | Chair | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Abiola Josina Adebisi Agana | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nana Hughes | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alexander DaCosta Cole | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Karen Nicole Salt | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Adele Johns-Shepherd | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eddy Akang | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christina Liciaga | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sunil Chotai | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.