IPSWICH ARTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arts Association providing contacts and advertising of events. Presentation of public concerts and lectures to general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 10 April 1984: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Paul Foster | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Motteram | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chandra Grover ALCM TD | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Michael Windsor | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Patrick Lloyd FCA | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Anne Wallace-Shaddad | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Beverley Ruddock | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Patricia Odam GGSMD | Trustee | 26 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA GRIMWADE | Trustee | 30 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christine Mary Pearce | Trustee | 08 January 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.58k | £2.45k | £3.47k | £4.85k | £4.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.33k | £1.85k | £2.57k | £2.51k | £3.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND SEPTEMBER 1982 AND AMENDED 28TH SEPTEMBER 1983 as amended on 24 Oct 2016 as amended on 28 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN, PROMOTE AND DEVELOP THE PRACTICE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATIN OF THE ARTS AMONG THE PEOPLE OF IPSWICH.
Area of benefit
IPSWICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 Forest Lane
Martlesham Heath
IPSWICH
IP5 3ST
- Phone:
- 01473 614456
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window