Financial history LYME REGIS LEISURE CENTRE

Charity Number: 288969
Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £44.57k £20.15k £44.28k £69.10k £60.07k
Total expenditure £50.22k £40.89k £40.90k £45.00k £38.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £8.09k N/A N/A N/A