CHARITY FOR A SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The endowment from which the charity receives its income was left to benefit educationally the children of the village of Ingoldisthorpe. Today the charity mainly helps the village school to buy equipment not funded from the schools normal budget.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
Governance
- 26 March 1984: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Timothy Ingrey | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev MARK ANDREW CAPRON | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.13k | £2.11k | £2.09k | £2.11k | £2.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £500 | £0 | £2.17k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 November 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 November 2022 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 March 2021 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 21ST DECEMBER 1983
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY (1) IN MAKING PAYMENTS TO THE GOVERNORS OF INGOLDISTHORPE PRIMARY SCHOOL TO BE APPLIED BY THEM IN DISCHARGING THEIR OBLIGATIONS UNDER THE EDUCATION ACTS 1944 TO 1980 WITH RESPECT TO THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SAID SCHOOL; (2) SUBJECT THERETO IN EITHER OR BOTH OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS: (A) IN OR TOWARDS PROVIDING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOR NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR THE SAID SCHOOL AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED BETWEEN THE MANAGING TRUSTEES AND THE SAID GOVERNORS AFTER CONSULTATION WITH THE SAID AUTHORITY; (B) IN PROMOTING IN SUCH WAYS AS THE MANAGING TRUSTEES THINK FIT THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF INGOLDISTHORPE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF INGOLDISTHORPE
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 The Old Coal Yard
Snettisham
KING'S LYNN
PE31 7FH
- Phone:
- 07973 745615
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window