THE CAPTAINS FUND LONDON DIVISION NAVAL RESERVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To administer, investment income, voluntary contributions from the Ship's Company of HMS PRESIDENT, and from others with an interest in the Unit in order to make charitable donations to encourage recruitment, increase military efficiency and relieve hardship and distress for members and the families of the Royal Naval Reserve in Greater London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 27 March 1984: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Commander Alistair Louis Worsley RD JP RNR | Chair | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cdr Laura Beth Harrison VR RNR | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lt Cdr Alan Mayes RD RNR | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan West RD RNR | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lt Cdr Michael Spencer VR RNR | Trustee | 07 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Warrant Officer I Antony Matthews QVRM VR | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lt Cdr Elizabeth Ann Church RD VR RNR | Trustee | 04 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chief Petty Officer Evadne Gordon VR RNR | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Captain Peter Baker RD DL RNR | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lt Cdr Stephen Bassett RD MBA RNR | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.04k | £6.24k | £5.91k | £6.90k | £7.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.06k | £2.36k | £3.34k | £3.51k | £6.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31ST DECEMBER 1983 as amended on 14 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
a. To promote the defence of the Realm by any of the following means: i. By encouraging the recruitment and retention of people in the Armed Forces, particularly the Royal Naval Reserve and in the London Division's SOI. ii. By increasing the military efficiency, profile and appeal of the Armed Forces, particularly units of the Royal Naval Reserve as described in the preceding clause. b. To help relieve members of the Royal Naval Reserve and their dependents within the London Divisions SOI who are in conditions of need, hardship, or distress.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lions Lodge
Cross in Hand
HEATHFIELD
TN21 0LU
- Phone:
- 01435868423
- Email:
- alistair.worsley@freeuk.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window