BASILDON UNIT 551 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 288994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

the aim of the sea cadets corps is to help young people towards responsible adulthood by encouraging valuable personal attributes and high standards of conduct, using a nautical theme based on the customs of the Royal Navy.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £8,767
Total expenditure: £7,469

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 March 1984: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 27 September 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BASILDON SEA CADETS (Working name)
  • T.S NAUTILUS (Working name)
  • T.S. NAUTILUS BASILDON SEA CADET CORPS NO.551 (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Wells Chair 20 February 2020
None on record
Janet Upton Trustee 24 September 2024
None on record
Goerge King Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Tony Flack Trustee 20 February 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.19k £11.26k £10.06k £3.94k £8.77k
Total expenditure £9.05k £5.38k £7.96k £8.44k £7.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £2.67k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 March 2024 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 February 2022 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
TS Nautilus
Next to Holy Cross Church
Church Road
Basildon
SS14 2EU
Phone:
01268 527816