Financial history VALLEY PARK RADIO

Charity Number: 289006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £6.07k £1.11k £722 £681 £4.20k
Total expenditure £3.78k £1.42k £1.52k £6.88k £4.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A