Trustees VALLEY PARK RADIO
Charity Number: 289006

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dave Lockyer MBE | Chair | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Werlemann | Trustee | 08 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Anthony Lennon | Trustee | 19 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alun Evans | Trustee | 20 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Traviss Whitehead | Trustee | 20 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Pearson | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clive Jenns | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WILKES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.