THE GREAT WESTERN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE COLLECTION, CONSERVATION AND DISPLAY OF ARTEFACTS AND MEMORABILIA OF THE GREAT WESTERN RAILWAY COMPANY, IT'S CONSTITUENTS AND SUCCESSORS. USING THIS COLLECTION TO EXPAND, DISSEMINATE AND ENABLE RESEARCH INTO HOW THE G.W.R. ENGINEERED, ORGANISED AND OPERATED IT'S VAST TRANSPORT UNDERTAKING. THE COLLECTION DEMONSTRATES IT'S INFLUENCE ON THE NATION, IT'S STAFF AND THE PUBLIC.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 April 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Terry Jones OBE | Chair | 27 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Matthew Searle | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor George Kenneth Freeman MD FRCGP | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger William Orchard | Trustee | 07 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY PATRICK ELLIOTT | Trustee | 23 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JAMES COOPER | Trustee | 07 April 2009 |
|
|
||||
PETER ANTHONY RANCE | Trustee | 06 March 1984 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £590.36k | £23.89k | £32.01k | £69.98k | £38.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.90k | £69.97k | £42.80k | £139.67k | £79.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £582.69k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.53k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £571.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £17.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.44k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6TH MARCH 1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13 DECEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE GREAT WESTERN SOCIETY LIMITED AND IN PATICULAR (I) TO MAINTAIN AND SUPPORT THE RAILWAY CENTRE AND THE STATIC AND WORKING MUSEUM MAINTAINED BY THE SOCIETY AT DIDCOT OR ELSEWHERE BY THE PROVISION OF OBJECTS FOR DISPLAY AND USE AND BY THE PAYMENT OF APPLICATION OF MONEY (II) TO ASSIST IN THE VOLUNTARY WORK ON THE RESTORATION AND MAINTENANCE OF ITEMS OF HISTORIC AND RAILWAY INTEREST AT THE DIDCOT RAILWAY CENTRE AND ELSEWHERE AND THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES UPON AND ORGANISATION OF EDUCATIONAL VISITS TO THE SOCIETY'S PREMISES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Great Western Trust
Didcot Railway Centre
Station Road
DIDCOT
Oxfordshire
OX11 7NJ
- Phone:
- 01235 817200
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window