ELDONPHAB LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a social club and have a Table Tennis section
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Croydon
- Surrey
Governance
- 30 March 1984: Standard registration
- ELDON PHAB CLUB (Working name)
- ELDON PHAB LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Furrie | Trustee | 01 July 2000 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM FREDRICK EARL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER BENJAMIN POSFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARU JOGLEKAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.37k | £3.04k | £4.66k | £8.47k | £8.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.51k | £8.56k | £8.70k | £9.90k | £10.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 173 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8TH MARCH 1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10TH JULY 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PHYSICAL RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITES FOR THE BENEFIT OF, AND TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF CROYDON (AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD) IN GENERAL AND THOSE INHABITANTS WHO ARE PHYSICALLY DISABLED IN PARTICULAR; WITHOUT DISTINCTION BY REFERENCE TO SEX, PARENTAGE, RELIGIOUS CREED, OR POLITICAL OPINION. SEE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES FOR FULL DETAILS.
Area of benefit
CROYDON AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Jacksons Way
Croydon
CR0 8EX
- Phone:
- 07411112812
- Email:
- goonerboy2810@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window