THE HAJRA SANAULLAH TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assistance to poor persons in Bareilly, India.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 07 August 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- India
Governance
- 05 April 1984: Standard registration
- 05 February 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HAJRA SANAULLAH TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 07/08/2009 | 07/08/2010 | 07/08/2011 | 07/08/2012 | 07/08/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £628 | £338 | £290 | £390 | £250 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.57k | £0 | £750 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 07 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 07 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 07 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 07 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 07 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 07 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 07 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 07 August 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 15TH MARCH 1984
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME AND CAPITAL THEREOF (1) THE EDUCATION OF MUSLIMS ATTENDING HIGHER SECONDARY SCHOOLS AND INTERMEDIATE COLLEGES IN THE BAREILLY DISTRICT OF UTTAR PRADESH AND ITS ADJOINING DISTRICTS AND VILLAGES. (2) THE UPKEEP REPAIR RESTORATION OR REBUILDING OF MOSQUES (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION. (4) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT OR PURPOSES. (FOR MORE DETAIL SEE CLAUSE 4 OF SETTLEMENT DATED 15TH MARCH 1984.)
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window