FAIRFORD STEAM RALLY LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Steam rally & show once a year held normally in August.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 30 March 1984: Standard registration
- 18 August 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FAIRFORD STEAM RALLY & SHOW (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/10/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.96k | £57.74k | £9.63k | £35.19k | £42.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.75k | £40.96k | £33.30k | £23.37k | £49.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2014 | 04 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2014 | 04 February 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 02 April 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 04 February 2015 | 96 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 11 April 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13TH SEPTEMBER 1983 AS AMENDED SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 15TH NOVEMBER 1983
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY INCREASING KNOWLEDGE OF AND INTEREST IN:- (I) HISTORIC MECHANICALLY PROPELLED VEHICLES INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TRACTION ENGINES, STEAMROLLERS AND OTHER STEAM VEHICLES; (II) OTHER HISTORIC MACHINERY INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERLITY OF THE FOREGOING) FAIR ORGANS, FAIRGROUND AND SHOWMEN'S EQUIPMENT, AND AGRICULTURAL MACHINERY AND EQUIPMENT; (III) HISTORIC CROFTS AND CRAFTSMENSHIP. (B) TO MAKE PAYMENTS IN FAVOUR OF SUCH REGISTERED CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE DIRECTORS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window