Accounts and annual returns INFORMATION SERVICES CHARITY LIMITED

Charity number: 289076
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 14 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 30 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 29 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 04 February 2008 4 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 16 February 2007 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 13 February 2007 13 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 14 February 2006 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 14 February 2006 14 days late
Annual return 31 March 2004 24 February 2005 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 24 February 2005 24 days late