TILES AND ARCHITECTURAL CERAMICS SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The study, recording and preservation of information and other material relating to tiles and architectural ceramics by way of education and guidance. We publish an annual academic journal and a less formal magazine. We arrange meetings, visits, lectures and similar activities both for members and the public. We encourage and provide information for conservation and artistic endeavour.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 May 1984: Standard registration
- T A C S (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Alan Swale | Chair | 05 July 2014 |
|
|||||
Michael Warcup Rieveley | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert McRorie Higgins | Trustee | 02 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Hampson | Trustee | 02 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Sarah Brown | Trustee | 02 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Miller | Trustee | 04 July 2015 |
|
|||||
LESLEY JANE DURBIN | Trustee | 05 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HUTCHINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY DAVID WATTS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.82k | £16.84k | £26.14k | £15.24k | £8.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.53k | £12.86k | £15.13k | £10.53k | £14.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND JULY 1983 AS AMENDED ON 13 JULY 1996 AND 15 JULY 2000
Charitable objects
THE STUDY, RECORDING AND PRESERVATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION OF INFORMATION AND ILLUSTRATIVE AND OTHER MATERIAL RELATING TO TILES AND ARCHITECTURAL CERAMICS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
TACS
PO Box 6719
COVENTRY
CV6 9PR
- Phone:
- 01676540947
- Email:
- info@tilesoc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window