GUJARAT HINDU WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE MAIN POINT ARE AS UNDER:- 1. ADVICE 2. BENEFIT 3. DAY CENTRE 4. TRAINING AND AWARENESS 5. LANGUAGE 6. CULTURAL ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newham
Governance
- 09 April 1984: Standard registration
- GUJARAT HINDU WELFARE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- GUJARAT WELFARE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NARENDRABHAI PATEL | Trustee | 06 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
DHIRAJLAL KANJI MANDALIA | Trustee | 06 May 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.76k | £25.06k | £51 | £2.05k | £2.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.25k | £9.27k | £7.60k | £15.16k | £17.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29TH FEBRUARY 1984 AS AMENDED 22ND SEPTEMBER 1999, 7 NOVEMBER 2001 AND 24 SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION, OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES AND EDUCATION FOR THE GUJARATI SPEAKING INHABITANTS OF EAST LONDON WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
EAST LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
141 Plashet Road
Plaistow
London
E13 0RA
- Phone:
- 02085520525
- Email:
- ghwa141@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window